EP1022339 - Plasmids, their construction and their use in the manufacture of interleukin-4 and interleukin-4 muteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2006/05] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Apeler, Heiner Dr. Neuer Triebel 71 42111 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Wehlmann, Hermann Dr. Mastweg 3a 42349 Wuppertal / DE | [2000/30] | Application number, filing date | 99100967.1 | 20.01.1999 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022339 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022339 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/70, C12N15/72, C12N15/24, C07K14/54 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/5406 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/70 (EP,US);
C12N15/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2001/14] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plasmide, deren Konstruktion und Anwendung zur Herstellung von Interleukin-4 und dessen Muteine | [2000/30] | English: | Plasmids, their construction and their use in the manufacture of interleukin-4 and interleukin-4 muteins | [2000/30] | French: | Plasmides, leur construction et utilisation pour la préparation d'Interleukine-4 et ses mutéines | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Request for further processing for: | 08.09.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.2005 | Decision despatched | 01.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2004 | Decision despatched | 14.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4689406 (BANKS ALLEN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 23 *; | [A]EP0241446 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 62 - page 9, line 58 *; | [A]US5362646 (BUJARD HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * Seq. c;; figure 54 *; | [A]WO9608572 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 30 * * page 10; table 1 * * Seq.ID:1 nt.66-110; page 14 * * page 21 - page 22; claim - *; | [A]WO9803654 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1,4 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 6 * * page 10, lines 4-30 *; | [Y] - PTITSYN L.R. AND AL'TMAN I.B., "Recombinant Escherichia coli strains provide high-level expression of human Interleukin-3 and Interleukin-4", BULLETIN OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, (199501), vol. 119, no. 1, pages 77 - 79, XP002106664 [Y] 1-4 * page 77; figure 1 * * page 79, column L, paragraph 8 - column R, paragraph 1 * | [AD] - HANNIG G. ET AL., "Strategies for optimizing heterologous protein expression in Escherichia coli", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (19980201), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 54 - 60, XP004107042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(97)01155-4 | [AD] - STUDIER F.W. ET AL., "Use of T7 RNA polymerase to direct expression of cloned genes", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (19900101), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89, XP000647676 [AD] 1 * page 74; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(90)85008-C | [A] - YOUNG YANG ET AL., "Production, purification and immuno-modulatory actions of E.coli-derived recombinant human interleukin 4", KOREAN BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1992), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 66 - 72, XP002106663 [A] 1,4 * page 68; figure 2 * | [A] - LEVINE A.D. ET AL., "High level expression and refolding of mouse Interleukin 4 synthesized in Escherichia coli", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19950331), vol. 270, no. 13, pages 7445 - 7452, XP002106665 [A] 1,4 * page 7447; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.13.7445 | [A] - HANSSENS F. ET AL., "Expression, renaturation and purification of murine Interleukin 4 from E. coli", MEDELINGEN VAN DE FACULTEIT LANDBOUWWETENSCHAPPEN UNIVERSITEIT GENT, (1992), vol. 57, no. 4b, pages 2053 - 2061, XP002107061 [A] 1,4 * page 2054, paragraph 5 - page 2058, paragraph 1 * | Examination | - MAKRIDES S.C., "Strategies for achieving high-level expression of genes in Escherichia coli", MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (19960901), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 512 - 538 |