Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0932290
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.02.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
26.10.2001 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
26.10.2001 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
02.10.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
18.09.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
01.03.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.04.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
18.02.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] |
11.02.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] |
09.02.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.06.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |