EP0933013 - Adjusting mechanism and cutting unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thier, Richard David W6515 Hillcrest Road Juneau, Wisconsin 53039 / US | 02 /
Reichen, Ronald Lee 718 Stow Street Horicon, Wisconsin 53032 / US | 03 /
Swenson, Phillip Orland 121 Lakeshore Terrace Beaver Dam, Wisconsin 53916 / US | 04 /
Niosi, Donald Emil 5075 Hope Street S.E. Prior Lake, Minnesota 55372 / US | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99101250.1 | 23.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | US19980015920 | 30.01.1998 Original published format: US 15920 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0933013 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933013 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/54 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
A01D34/54 (EP,US);
A01D2101/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2000/15] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verstellmechanismus und Schneideinheit | [1999/31] | English: | Adjusting mechanism and cutting unit | [1999/31] | French: | Mécanisme de réglage et unité de coupe | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2212884 (TORO CO) [X] 1,6,11 * page 8, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 3 * [A] 2,3; | [X]GB516932 (ALLAN STEWARD CAMBRIDGE) [X] 1,11 * page 4, line 4 - line 110 *; | [A]US2624168 (CLEMSON RICHARD D) [A] 1,3,11 * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 2; figure 8 *; | [A]GB2137063 (BIRMID QUALCAST); | [A]DE1482913 (TORO MFG CORP); | [A]US1802304 (ANDERSON WILLIAM A); | [A]US2335054 (GODWIN HIRAM F); | [A]EP0106452 (BIRMID QUALCAST HOME & GARDEN [GB]); | [A]WO9103927 (RANSOMES SIMS & JEFFERIES LTD [GB]) |