EP0936337 - Return and tensioning device for the chain drive of a garage door drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOMFY Feinmechanik und Elektrotechnik GmbH Felix-Wankel-Strasse 50 72108 Rottenburg / DE | [2000/44] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, Norbert Untere Brandstrasse 48 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Buehner, Peter Suedliche Alleenstrasse 15 71679 Asperg / DE | 03 /
Siegwart, Bernhard Trollingerstrasse 6/1 71723 Grossbottwar / DE | 04 /
Grabandt, Peter Fliederweg 7 71686 Remseck / DE | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Jakelski, Joachim Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Jakelski, Joachim, Dr. Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | ||
Former [2000/34] | Otte, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte, Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99101260.0 | 23.01.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | DE1998202198U | 10.02.1998 Original published format: DE 29802198 U | [1999/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936337 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936337 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/16 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
E05F15/681 (EP);
E05Y2201/47 (EP);
E05Y2201/654 (EP);
E05Y2201/668 (EP);
E05Y2600/13 (EP);
E05Y2900/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI [2000/17] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umlenk- und Spannvorrichtung für die Antriebskette eines Garagentorantriebs | [1999/33] | English: | Return and tensioning device for the chain drive of a garage door drive | [1999/33] | French: | Dispositif de renvoi et de tension pour une chaîne d'entraînement d'une commande d'une porte de garage | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 23.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 02.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.05.2003 | IT | 28.05.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | AT | 23.01.2004 | CH | 31.01.2004 | LI | 31.01.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/36] | GB | 28.05.2003 | |
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
AT | 23.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | GB | 28.05.2003 | |
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 28.05.2003 | |
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | ES | 08.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB949353 (BERRY DOOR CORP, et al) [X] 1-3,6 * page 2, line 96 - line 120; figure 3 * [Y] 7; | [DY]DE4342380 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DY] 7* abstract *; | [X]EP0732476 (HOERMANN KG VERKAUFSGES [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 3, line 1 - line 17; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0743416 (HOERMANN KG VERKAUFSGES [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 26 - line 46; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4342380 |