Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2949576B | Global Dossier | 13.09.1999 | B2 | JPH11218272 | 10.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2085698 | 02.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0933577 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2004 | B1 | EP0933577 | 04.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2085698 | 02.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69920988T | 09.02.2006 | T2 | DE69920988D1 | 18.11.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2085698 | 02.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6045164 | 04.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2085698 | 02.02.1998 |