EP0933577 - A pipe joint made of resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishio, Kiyoshi, c/o Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba Shimouchigami, Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99101323.6 | 25.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | JP19980020856 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2085698 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0933577 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933577 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/04, F16L47/04 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
F16L19/041 (EP,US);
F16L47/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/15] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rohrkupplung aus synthetischem Harz | [1999/31] | English: | A pipe joint made of resin | [1999/31] | French: | Raccord de tuyaux en résine synthétique | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0823578 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0365821 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5388871 (SAITOH MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |