EP0933559 - Friction roller type continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Haruhito 7-8-5, Shukugawara, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214-0021 / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Masaki 2140-41, Kamiiida-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 245-0018 / JP | 03 /
Sugihara, Jun 2-92, Urago-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0062 / JP | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99101332.7 | 25.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | JP19980016622 | 29.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1662298 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933559 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933559 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933559 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/38 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
F16H15/38 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stufenloses Reibrollengetriebe | [1999/31] | English: | Friction roller type continuously variable transmission | [1999/31] | French: | Variateur continu de vitesse à rouleaux de traction | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PDX]EP0882910 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PDX] 1,2,6-12 * figure 5 *; | [A]JPH08145134 ; | JPH08145134 [ ] (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [ ] * figure 2 *; | [A]US4905529 (NAKANO MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]US4955246 (NAKANO MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, & JP08145134 A 19960604 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH01295070 | JPH09147354 | JPH1016622 | US19980090183 |