|
19.01.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Supplemental sheet D (claims incurring fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1999 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
20.04.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.01.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
26.01.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.01.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |