EP0936408 - Gas burner for cooking range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [1999/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giraud, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Parkstrasse 1 76297 Stutensee-Fr. / DE | 02 /
Haberl, Werner Fuchslochstrasse 39 75015 Bretten-Ruit / DE | [1999/33] | Application number, filing date | 99101666.8 | 04.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | DE1998105559 | 11.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19805559 | [1999/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0936408 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0936408 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936408 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/06 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
F23D14/06 (EP);
F23D2207/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/42] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gasbrenner für Kochstellen | [1999/33] | English: | Gas burner for cooking range | [1999/33] | French: | Brûleur à gaz pour une plaque de cuisson | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2153988 (THORN EMI DOMESTIC APPLIANCES)[X] 1,2; | [X]US5492469 (ODA KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 1-3; | [X]US5690483 (ODA KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 1-3; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, XP002900736 [X] 1-4 | Examination | US4419074 |