EP0934756 - Capillary drainage tube system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRIMED HALBERSTADT MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH Strasse des 20. Juli 1 38820 Halberstadt / DE | [1999/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neubauer, Norbert Pfeiffers Garten 3 38820 Halberstadt / DE | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Pfeiffer, Rolf-Gerd Patentanwaltsbüro Pfeiffer & Partner Winzerlaer Strasse 10 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Pfeiffer, Rolf-Gerd, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltsbüro Pfeiffer & Partner Winzerlaer Strasse 10 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102063.7 | 28.01.1999 | [1999/32] | Priority number, date | DE1998105096 | 09.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19805096 | [1999/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0934756 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0934756 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
A61M25/0021 (EP);
A61M25/0023 (EP);
A61M25/0069 (EP);
A61M27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/35] |
Former [1999/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kapillar-Drainageschlauch-System | [1999/32] | English: | Capillary drainage tube system | [1999/32] | French: | Tube Capillaire de drainage système | [1999/32] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 01.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/09] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.2001 | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE387654 (M. H. HANTSCHER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE8813995U (M S MEDI-SYST) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4579555 (RUSSO RONALD D) [A] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 37; figures 4-9 *; | [A]EP0145505 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1 * page 8, line 24 - page 12, line 5; figures 1,2,5 * * page 12, line 35 - page 15, line 29; figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]RU1803145 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19940727), vol. 94, no. 23, Database accession no. 94-189841, XP002120585 & SU1803145 A 19930323 (BORISOV A I) [A] 1 * abstract * |