EP0953535 - Method and apparatus for the supply and storage of cans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt Spinnereimaschinenbau AG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [1999/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueding, Michael Schwanthaler Strasse 32 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
Kovacs, Otmar Eibenweg 3 92334 Berching / DE | 03 /
Peter, Carsten Rudolf-Heine-Strasse 8 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [2004/14] |
Former [1999/44] | 01 /
Ueding, Michael Schwanthaler Strasse 32 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
02 /
Kavacs, Otmar Eibenweg 3 92334 Berching / DE | |||
03 /
Peter, Carsten Rudolf-Heine-Strasse 8 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102071.0 | 02.02.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | DE1998119376 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19819376 | [1999/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953535 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953535 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953535 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/04 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
D01H9/185 (EP,US);
B65H67/0428 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2002/04] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und vorrichtung zum zuführen und abstellen von kannen | [1999/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for the supply and storage of cans | [1999/44] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'approvisionnement et le stockage de pots | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 03.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.12.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5471711 (KOVACS OTMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,12,14,16-18,20 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [YA]US5276947 (FRITSCHI ISIDOR [CH], et al) [Y] 7 * column 9, line 47 - line 62 * * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 20 * [A] 1,5; | [A]US5634316 (LEIFELD FERDINAND [DE]) [A] * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 16 *; | [A]US5729868 (LIEDGENS HANS-PETER [DE], et al) [A] * column 2, line 19 - line 40 *; | [A]US4227848 (KRIECHBAUM KURT, et al) [A] * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 13 * |