EP0933405 - Aqueous ink composition, process for preparing the same, and ink jet recording using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mukaiyama, Keiichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Mukai, Hiroshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102096.7 | 02.02.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | JP19980020549 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2054998 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0933405 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933405 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C09D11/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/15] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wässrige Tintenzusammensetzung, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Aufzeichnung mittels dieses Tintenstrahls | [1999/31] | English: | Aqueous ink composition, process for preparing the same, and ink jet recording using the same | [1999/31] | French: | Composition d'encre aqueuse, sa méthode de préparation et impression par jet d'encre utilisant cette encre | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2055116 (CANON KK) [A] 1,2,4,8-10 * page 1, lines 42-47 * * page 2, lines 54-64 * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 15 * * page 59, lines 1-15 *; | [A]EP0612820 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 17 * * page 31, lines 43-48 * * page 29, line 56 - page 30, line 27 *; | [DA]EP0790127 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [DA] 1,9,10 |