Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1013778T | 31.08.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP99102445 | 09.02.1999 | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3281614B | Global Dossier | 13.05.2002 | B2 | JP2000192157 | 11.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1013778 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2001 | B1 | EP1013778 | 28.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE201050T | 15.05.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9901289 | 05.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2261501 | 18.11.2003 | C | CA2261501 | 22.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1139663C | 25.02.2004 | C | CN1261106 | 26.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19859354 | 06.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59900087D1 | 13.06.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1013778T | 13.08.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2157674T | 16.08.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3036284T | 31.10.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1030796 | 18.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100318121B | 22.12.2001 | B1 | KR20000047372 | 25.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL337312 | 03.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1013778E | 30.08.2001 | E | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW523549B | 11.03.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6231638 | 15.05.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA991337 | 19.12.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19859354 | 22.12.1998 |