EP1013778 - Method and apparatus for producing metal from metal ores [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Der Grüne Punkt-Duales System Deutschland Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurter Strasse 720-726 51145 Köln / DE | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janz, Joachim, Dr. Feldstrasse 28 28876 Oyten / DE | 02 /
Voss, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Oberneulander Heerstrasse 84 28355 Bremen / DE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102445.6 | 09.02.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE1998159354 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859354 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013778 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013778 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C21B5/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C21B5/023 (EP,US);
C21B5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 28.12.2000 | LV | 28.12.2000 | RO | 28.12.2000 | SI | 28.12.2000 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Metall aus Metallerzen | [2000/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing metal from metal ores | [2000/26] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la production de métal à partir de minerais métalliques | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 22.12.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.04.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61153218 ; | [A]JPH06335628 ; | [A]FR597770 (CIE DU CARBONE PULVERISE POUR); | [A]DE2714355 (KLEIN ALB KG); | [A]EP0059904 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0622465 (KLOECKNER STAHL GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861129), vol. 010, no. 355, Database accession no. (C - 388), & JP61153218 A 19860711 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 095, no. 003, & JP06335628 A 19941206 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] * abstract * |