EP0916316 - Device for cleaning and/or disinfecting and care of medical or dental instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaltenbach & Voigt GmbH & Co. KG Bismarckring 39 88400 Biberach/Riss / DE | [2003/22] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH & CO. Bismarckring 39 88396 Biberach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinhauser, Pius Nachtigallenweg 36 88299 Leutkirch / DE | 02 /
Bodenmiller, Anton Tautenhofen 12 88299 Leutkirch / DE | 03 /
Lott, Herbert Humberg 5 88410 Bad Wurzach-Arnach / DE | [1999/32] |
Former [1999/20] | 01 /
Steinhauser, Pius Hädrichweg 8 88299 Leutkirch / DE | ||
02 /
Bodenmiller, Anton Tautenhofen 12 88299 Leutkirch / DE | |||
03 /
Lott, Herbert Oberschwarzach 88410 Bad Wurzach / DE | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102463.9 | 22.10.1993 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | DE19924235699 | 22.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4235699 | [1999/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0916316 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0916316 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0916316 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61L2/02, A61C9/00 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
A61L2/04 (EP);
A61B90/70 (EP);
A61C19/002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/20] | A61B19/00, A61L2/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1999/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Reinigen und/oder Desinfizieren und Pflegen von ärztlichen oder zahnärztlichen Instrumenten | [1999/20] | English: | Device for cleaning and/or disinfecting and care of medical or dental instruments | [1999/20] | French: | Dispositif pour le nettoyage et le traitement des instruments médicaux et dentaires | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 08.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93117198.7 / EP0598247 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3232329 (KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 19; figures 9-13; claim 28 *; | [A]EP0300945 (MICRO MEGA SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 55-62; figure 1 *; | [AP]DE9310601U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AP] 1* page 8, lines 25-29; figures 5,6 * | by applicant | DE4024171 |