EP0935953 - Intraocular lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anschütz, Till Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 3 76571 Gaggenau / DE | [1999/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102554.5 | 10.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | DE1998105780 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19805780 | [1999/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0935953 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0935953 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/1602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/49] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Intraocularlinse | [1999/33] | English: | Intraocular lens | [1999/33] | French: | Lentille intraoculaire | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 30.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IE | 01.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9727825 (SOLEKO S P A [IT], et al) [DY] 1-10 * page 12, line 19 - page 14, line 1; figures 4-6 *; | [Y]EP0128784 (DANIELE SYLVIE ARON ROSA) [Y] 1-10 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 18; figures 4-6 *; | [A]EP0226400 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO8701931 (TILLAY MICHAEL J) [A] 1-10 * page 18, line 11 - line 19; figure 8 *; | [A]US4615702 (KOZIOL JEFFREY E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0556040 (IOLAB CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0326373 (COOPER CO INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * page 4, line 38 - line 57; figure 4 * | by applicant | WO9727825 | US5628796 | US3986214 | EP0061282 |