EP0943472 - Passenger vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuster, Gerd, Dr. St.Margarethen-Strasse 20 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | 02 /
Siring, Harald Friedrich-List-Strasse 110 81377 München / DE | [1999/38] | Application number, filing date | 99102585.9 | 11.02.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | DE1998111814 | 18.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19811814 | [1999/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0943472 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0943472 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943472 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/18, B60J7/04 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
B60J7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/09] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Personenkraftwagen | [1999/38] | English: | Passenger vehicle | [1999/38] | French: | Véhicule de passagers | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 31.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5078447 (KLEIN GEORGE W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, line 1 - line 11 * * column 9, line 47 - line 53; figures 1-3B *; | [A]US3567209 (LATHERS MICHAEL W) [A] 1 * column 2, line 14 - line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3616017 (FIENER JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19631213 (MC MICRO COMPACT CAR AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3843675 | DE3602298 | DE4341343 |