EP0942111 - Adhesive rubber article having scored release liner and guide to facilitate field application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BFS Diversified Products, LLC 525 Congressional Boulevard Carmel, Indiana 46032-5607 / US | [2002/17] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, INC. 1200 Firestone Parkway Akron, Ohio 44317 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalwara, Joseph J. 6050 N. Broadway Indianapolis 46220 Indiana / US | 02 /
Barksdale, Daniel L. 8902 Cindy Lane Brownsburg 46112 Indiana / US | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/37] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102837.4 | 01.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | US19980037564 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: US 37564 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942111 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E04D5/12, C09J7/02 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
E04D5/12 (EP,US);
C09J7/203 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
C09J7/241 (EP,US);
C09J2301/122 (EP,US);
C09J2301/304 (EP,US);
C09J2421/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/141 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/15 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Haftgegenstand aus Kautschuk mit perforierter Trennschicht und Applikationsmarkierung | [1999/37] | English: | Adhesive rubber article having scored release liner and guide to facilitate field application | [1999/37] | French: | Article en caoutchouc ayant une bande de séparation perforée et un marquage pour faciliter l'application | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05247414 ; | [A]US4757652 (KALKANOGLU HUSNU [US]) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 23 - line 36 * * figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 58 - line 61 *; | [A]US4966788 (PELL EDWARD A [US]) [A] 1-3,10-12,16 * column 1, line 12 - line 29 * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]US5504136 (DAVIS JAMES A [US], et al) [DA] 1-29 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 31 - line 38 *; | [XA]DE19533090 (KRONENBERG BERND DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 19,20 * column 1, line 41 - line 64 * * column 3, line 7 - line 28 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,4-6,10-16,28,29 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940106), vol. 018, no. 004, Database accession no. (C - 1149), & JP05247414 A 19930924 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |