EP0941832 - Eccentric press with variable slide movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schuler Pressen GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstrasse 41 73033 Göppingen / DE | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegener, Konrad, Dr.-Ing. Friedrichstrasse 47 73033 Göppingen / DE | [1999/37] | Application number, filing date | 99102839.0 | 01.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | DE1998110406 | 11.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19810406 | [1999/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941832 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B30B1/26, F16C3/28 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B30B15/0064 (EP);
B30B1/263 (EP);
B30B1/266 (EP);
F16C3/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Exzenterpresse mit variabler Stösselbewegung | [1999/37] | English: | Eccentric press with variable slide movement | [1999/37] | French: | Presse à excentrique avec mouvement variable du coulisseau | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19640439 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG) [X] 1-5,10,12,17,19 * abstract * [Y] 6-9,11,13-16,18; | [Y]US5299443 (NAKAMURA MASATOSHI) [Y] 6,7 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2201109 (EUMUCO AG FUER MASCHINENBAU) [Y] 8 * page 4, line 31 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3983738 (VLASOV VIKTOR IVANOVICH ET AL) [Y] 9,11,16 * abstract *; | [Y]US4785732 (CZAPKA ROBERT ET AL) [Y] 13-15,18 * figure - *; | [A]GB2182750 (BLECHBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINENWERK) [A] 1,3-5 * page 2, line 21 - line 33; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4219405 (HENSEL EISENWERK) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0561604 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [AD] 1,2,10,17 * abstract *; | [AD]DE2305638 (JOSEPH RHODES & SONS LTD) [AD] 1,3-5 * figure - * |