EP0940984 - Terminal device for multimedia data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Eiji 227-1, Uchinoumi, Yasuura-cho Toyota-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Hanaura, Toshitaka 26-18-303, Takata 1-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawano, Shinji 3-7-402, Rakurakuen 3-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakabe, Futoshi 8-28-28, Nishihara, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Gallileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99102857.2 | 02.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | JP19980051155 | 03.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5115598 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940984 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940984 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940984 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H04N21/4332 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
G06F16/125 (EP,US);
G06F16/1737 (EP,US);
H04N21/4335 (EP,US);
H04N21/485 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99953 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/36] | H04N7/173, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2003/16] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anschlussvorrichtung fürMultimediadaten | [1999/36] | English: | Terminal device for multimedia data | [1999/36] | French: | Terminal pour données multimédia | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.09.2007 | [2008/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5319455 (HOARTY WILLIAM LEO [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 8, line 15 - line 49 * * abstract *; | [YA]US5568181 (GREENWOOD DAVID G [US], et al) [Y] 13 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 9 * * column 5, line 29 - line 51 * [A] 1-10; | [YA] - LIAO T, "WebCanal: a multicast Web application", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970901), vol. 29, no. 8-13, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1091 - 1102, XP004095307 [Y] 13 * page 1091, column L, line 1 - column R, line 22; figure 1 * * page 1099, column L, line 19 - column R, line 29 * * page 1093, column R, line 16 - page 1094, column L, line 9 * [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(97)00012-3 | [A] - PAPADIMITRIOU C ET AL, "Multimedia information caching for personalized video-on-demand", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950301), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 204 - 216, XP004032501 [A] 1,13 * page 206, column L, line 16 - page 207, column L, line 32; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-3664(95)98543-E | Examination | - NARASIMHA REDDY A.L., "Effectiveness of caching policies for a Web server", PROC. FOURTH INT. CONF. ON HIGH-PERFORMANCE COMPUTING, Bangalore, India, (19971218), pages 94 - 99 |