EP1033581 - Polarization transfer by cross-correlated relaxation in solution NMR with very large molecules (CRINEPT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruker BioSpin AG Industriestrasse 26 8117 Fällanden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Bruker BioSpin AG Industriestrasse 26 8117 Fällanden / CH | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Bruker AG Industriestrasse 26 8117 Fällanden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riek, Roland, Dr. Allerheiligen 17 6432 Rickenbach / CH | 02 /
Wider, Gerhard, PD Dr. Humrigenflustr. 48 A 8704 Herrliberg / CH | 03 /
Pervushin, Konstantin, Dr. Milchbuckstr. 1 8057 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Wüthrich, Kurt, Prof.Dr. Fliederstrasse 7 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103142.8 | 18.02.1999 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033581 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033581 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/46 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
G01R33/4608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2001/21] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polarisationstransfer durch kreuzkorrelierte Relaxation in Kernspinresonanzuntersuchungen an sehr grossen Molekülen in Lösung (CRINEPT) | [2000/36] | English: | Polarization transfer by cross-correlated relaxation in solution NMR with very large molecules (CRINEPT) | [2000/36] | French: | Transfert de polarisation par relaxation corrélée en croix dans la RMN avec de très grandes molécules en solution (CRINEPT) | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 07.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX] - WIMPERIS S ET AL, "Relaxation-allowed cross-peaks in two-dimensional NMR correlation spectroscopy", MOLECULAR PHYSICS, 10 APRIL 1989, UK, ISSN 0026-8976, vol. 66, no. 5, pages 897 - 919, XP002051028 [DX] 1,3,5,6,8 * see the whole document; in particular chapters 2-4 * | [A] - DALVIT C, "/sup 1/H to /sup 15/N polarization transfer via /sup 1/H chemical-shift anisotropy-/sup 1/H to /sup 15/N dipole-dipole cross correlation", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, MAY 1992, USA, ISSN 0022-2364, vol. 97, no. 3, pages 645 - 650, XP002108360 [A] 1,3,5,13 | [DA] - K.PERVUSHIN ET AL., "Attenuated T2 relaxation by mutual cancellation of dipole-dipole coupling and chemical shift anisotropy indicates an avenue to NMR structures of very large biological macromolecules in solution", PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 12366 - 12371, XP002108361 [DA] 1-4,6,7,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.23.12366 | [DA] - L.MÜLLER, "Sensitivity Enhanced Detection of Weak Nuclei Using Heteronuclear Multiple Quantum Coherence", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1979), vol. 101, no. 16, pages 4481 - 4484, XP002108362 [DA] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00510a007 |