EP1029977 - Composition for treating an absorbent paper product and an absorbent paper product treated with said composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products GmbH Postfach 31 04 20 68264 Mannheim / DE | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichhorn, Stephan Tannenstrasse 25 64579 Gernsheim / DE | 02 /
Urban, Andrea Kranichstrasse 11 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103169.1 | 18.02.1999 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029977 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/22 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
D21H21/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Extension states | AL | 23.01.2001 | LT | 23.01.2001 | LV | 23.01.2001 | MK | 23.01.2001 | RO | 23.01.2001 | SI | 23.01.2001 | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von einem saugfähigen Papierprodukt, und behandeltes Papierprodukt | [2000/34] | English: | Composition for treating an absorbent paper product and an absorbent paper product treated with said composition | [2000/34] | French: | Composition de traitement de papier absorbant, et papier traité | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 29.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS61289016 [ ] (POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., JAPAN); | [A]US5705164 (MACKEY LARRY NEIL ET AL) [A] 1,21,24 * example 2 *; | [AD]WO9730217 (LEBOEUF JEAN FRANCOIS ;BRET BRUNO (FR); KAYSERSBERG SA (FR)) [AD] 1,21,24 * column W *; | [AD]US5525345 (WARNER ALRICK V ET AL); | [AD]WO9624723 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) | [X] - MATSUMOTO, KATSUO ET AL, "Skin cosmetics containing amino acids, vitamins, and sugars", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870504), vol. 106, no. 18, Database accession no. 143812, XP002108014 [X] 1,11,16 * abstract * |