27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
07.07.2007 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
20.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
20.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
06.02.2007 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.02.2007 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
18.11.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
26.10.2005 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
24.06.2005 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
18.06.2005 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
18.06.2005 |
Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.06.2005 |
Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: receipt of reply |
|
18.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
03.06.2005 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] |
01.06.2005 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
01.06.2005 |
Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.06.2005 |
Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: receipt of reply |
|
27.05.2005 |
Opposition filed |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
21.05.2005 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
21.05.2005 |
Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
02.07.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
02.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.02.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
18.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.03.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] |
08.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
23.11.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
14.09.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] |
23.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
27.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.12.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] |
06.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |