EP0943473 - Vehicle with convertible top [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumert, Jochen Schenkstrasse 5 60489 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Zintler, Albert Weserstrasse 15 64521 Gross-Gerau / DE | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [1999/38] | Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys. Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103170.9 | 18.02.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | DE1998111232 | 14.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19811232 | [1999/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0943473 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0943473 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943473 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/12 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
B60J7/0573 (EP);
B60R21/01512 (EP);
B60R21/01538 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2001/44] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einem verfahrbaren Verdeck | [1999/38] | English: | Vehicle with convertible top | [1999/38] | French: | Véhicule avec capote pliante | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 22.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
17.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Open Air Systems GmbH Kraillinger Str. 5 82152 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative Konnerth, Dieter Hans Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
17.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Open Air Systems GmbH Kraillinger Str. 5 82152 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative Konnerth, Dieter Hans Wiese & Konnerth Georgenstrasse 6 82152 Planegg / DE | 22.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.10.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2007 | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.03.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.04.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.11.2004 | [2005/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5531472 (SEMCHENA JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4433601 (BRUSE KURT [DE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0764553 (PININFARINA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 27 - line 31 *; | [PA]JPH10278592 ; | [A]DE3527405 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10278592 A 19981020 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [PA] 1,6 * abstract * |