Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6388839 | 14.05.2002 | B2 | US2001038513 | 08.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88621801 | 22.06.2001 | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | US24923699 | 11.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11238291 | Global Dossier | 31.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0938078 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2002 | B1 | EP0938078 | 05.01.2000 | A3 | EP0938078 | 25.08.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1145932C | 14.04.2004 | C | CN1228576 | 15.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69903484D1 | 21.11.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19990072785 | 27.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY129291 | 30.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW422970B | 21.02.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6304419 | 16.10.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP3919098 | 20.02.1998 |