EP0938078 - Magnetic head device and recording medium drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Souda, Yutaka c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Akiho, Hiraku c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ito, Wataru c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103192.3 | 18.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | JP19980039190 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3919098 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938078 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0938078 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938078 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/00, G11B5/60 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G11B5/6005 (EP,US);
G11B5/127 (KR);
G11B5/012 (EP,US);
G11B5/016 (EP,US);
G11B5/10 (EP,US);
G11B5/4886 (EP,US);
G11B5/58 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/34] | G11B5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/37] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetkopfvorrichtung und Aufzeichnungsmediumantrieb | [1999/34] | English: | Magnetic head device and recording medium drive | [1999/34] | French: | Dispositif à tête magnétique et dispositif d'entraînement pour support d'enregistrement | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 17.01.2003 | GB | 18.02.2003 | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/02] | DE | 17.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH08203055 ; | [A]US4974106 (WHITE JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 5,11,16 * column 3, line 4 - column 3, line 58; figure 2 *; | [A]US5287235 (CUNNINGHAM EARL A [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7,9-19* column 5, line 8 - column 8, line 61; figures 1,3,9 *; | [A]US5640755 (KUBOTA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,9,11-14,16-18 * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 60; figures 1,2 *; | US5751515 [ ] (KASAHARA AKIHIRO [JP]) [ ] * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 63; figures 4-7 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08203055 A 19960809 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 5 * abstract * [A] 1-4,7,9-19 |