EP0937404 - Separator of loops of sausages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inotec GmbH Dieselstrasse 1 72770 Reutlingen-Betzingen / DE | [1999/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borchers, Uwe Vahrer Strasse 33 28309 Bremen / DE | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter, et al Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter, et al Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2000/03] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat., et al Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | Heiland, Karsten, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103370.5 | 22.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | DE1998202978U | 20.02.1998 Original published format: DE 29802978 U | [1999/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0937404 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0937404 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/12 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
A22C11/006 (EP);
A22C15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT, NL [2001/21] |
Former [2001/18] | |||
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, LI | ||
Former [2001/13] | |||
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wurstschlaufenabschneider | [1999/34] | English: | Separator of loops of sausages | [1999/34] | French: | Séparateur de boucles de saucisses | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/11] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.03.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2001 | 28.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2001 | 28.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2001 | 28.02.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2001 | 28.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2001 | 28.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.03.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0503720 (RIGHELE GIOVANNI [IT]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract *; | [X]US4233709 (SMITH DAVID W, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 5 - line 51; figure - *; | [X]EP0007927 (TOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 3 - line 19; figure - *; | [X]US3545035 (PIEREDER LUDWIG) [X] 1,4,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]CH655459 (BÄCHTOLD WALTER) [X] 1 * the whole document * |