EP0942126 - Locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schliessanlagen GmbH Pfaffenhain Fabrikstrasse 1 09387 Pfaffenhain / DE | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hertel, Jörg Ludwigstrasse 8 09394 Hohndorf / DE | 02 /
Köhler, Konrad Grüner Winkel 12 09387 Jahnsdorf / DE | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Steffen, et al Findeisen & Neumann Patentanwälte Pornitzstrasse 1 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Neumann, Steffen, et al Patentanwälte, Findeisen & Neumann, Andréstrasse 25 09112 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103451.3 | 23.02.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | DE1998108638 | 28.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19808638 | [1999/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942126 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942126 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05B19/00 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
E05B19/0017 (EP);
E05B27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schliessvorrichtung | [1999/37] | English: | Locking device | [1999/37] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 16.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, PT | 24.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1678135 (ZEISS IKON AG) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0248787 (TIEFENTHAL SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMB [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4422093 (WILKA SCHLIESTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |