EP1031435 - Device for binding a stack of documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSELTE N.V. Industriepark Noord 30, P.O. Box 85 9100 St. Niklaas / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states ESSELTE N.V. Industriepark Noord 30, P.O. Box 85 9100 St. Niklaas / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maes, Dirk Klipsenstraat 12 9160 Lokeren / BE | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | Wolff, Felix, Dr. Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Andres, Angelika Maria Meto International GmbH Westerwaldstrasse 3-13 64646 Heppenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103482.8 | 23.02.1999 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031435 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031435 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B42F9/00 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
B42B5/06 (EP);
B42F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, NL, SE [2001/20] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Binden eines Dokumentenstapels | [2000/35] | English: | Device for binding a stack of documents | [2000/35] | French: | Dispositif pour relier une pile de documents | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 20.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.07.2003 | GR | 09.10.2003 | [2007/18] |
Former [2004/14] | GR | 09.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191318675 (DIXON) [A] 1 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 32; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR473601 (HAAKE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB138734 (WILSON); | [A]US2259505 (WISDOM) |