blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968748

EP0968748 - Process for recovering gases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krupp Uhde GmbH
Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15
44141 Dortmund / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Menzel, Johannes
Gripplostrasse 49
46045 Oberhausen / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3
45127 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date99103527.024.02.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812938901.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829389
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968748
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968748
Date:28.06.2000
[2000/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:B01D53/14, C10K1/08, C10L3/10
[2000/26]
CPC:
B01D53/1425 (EP); B01D53/14 (EP); B01D53/1493 (EP);
C10K1/08 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/01]B01D53/14, C10K1/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/10]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Gasen[2000/01]
English:Process for recovering gases[2000/01]
French:Procédé de récuperation de gaz[2000/01]
Examination procedure25.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
25.11.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
22.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
24.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/15]
29.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4242108  (HEGARTY WILLIAM P ET AL) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 18 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 34 * * column 6, line 23 - line 38; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4591370  (GAZZI LUIGI ET AL) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 53 - line 57 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 22 - line 46; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0528709  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROL) [A] 1-4 * figure 4; example 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.