EP0939476 - Device for central emergency lighting supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INOTEC Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Am Buschgarten 17 59469 Ense / DE | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaas, Wilfried Zum Steinbruch 1a 59519 Möhnesee / DE | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Basfeld, Rainer, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Basfeld, Rainer, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Basfeld, Rainer, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Mühlenberg 74 59759 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103538.7 | 24.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | DE19981007844 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19807844 | [1999/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0939476 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0939476 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939476 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0939476 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, H02J9/02 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H05B41/40 (EP,US);
H02J9/02 (EP);
H05B41/36 (EP);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y04S20/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/35] | H02J9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/36] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur zentralen Notlichtversorgung | [1999/35] | English: | Device for central emergency lighting supply | [1999/35] | French: | Dispositif pour l'alimentation centrale d'un éclairage de sécurité | [2001/31] |
Former [1999/35] | Dispositif pour l'alimentation centrale d' un éclairage de sécurité | Examination procedure | 06.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kaufel GmbH & Co. KG, NIFE Thomas & Betts Colditzstr. 34 - 36 12099 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Zucker, Volker Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kaufel GmbH & Co. KG, NIFE Thomas & Betts Colditzstr. 34 - 36 12099 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Zucker, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Effert, Bressel und Kollegen Patentanwälte Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | 13.08.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.12.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.06.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.03.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.04.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 09.09.2003 | Appeal received No. T0977/03 | 24.09.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.03.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 08.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.10.2001 | IT | 04.10.2001 | [2008/16] |
Former [2002/37] | GB | 04.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3809917 (VORE R) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** column 2, line 33 - line 49 *; | [A]DE3112314 (CEAG LICHT & STROM [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Opposition | DE2835549 | DE3030411 | DE3424991 | DE3618790 | DE4136673 | EP0786850 | DE19611161 | - MLAR Fassung 1989, Seiten 4 bis 6 | - MLAR Fassung 1993, Seiten 94 bis 97 |