EP0964216 - Load conveyor device for heat treatment furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALD Vacuum Technologies Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 35 63450 Hanau / DE | [2003/41] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states ALD Vacuum Technologies AG Wilhelm-Rohn-Str. 35 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states ALD Vacuum Technologies GmbH Rückinger Strasse 12 63526 Erlensee / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaschinski, Karl-Heinz Wingertsweg 3 63589 Linsengericht / DE | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Hebing, Norbert Patentanwalt Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Hebing, Norbert Patentanwalt, Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103558.5 | 24.02.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | DE1998126326 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19826326 | [1999/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964216 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964216 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F27D3/00, F27D3/12, B65G25/02 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
F27D3/00 (EP);
F27D3/12 (EP);
B65G25/02 (EP);
F27B9/38 (EP);
F27D2003/0049 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Chargentransportvorrichtung für Wärmebehandlungsöfen | [1999/50] | English: | Load conveyor device for heat treatment furnaces | [1999/50] | French: | Dispositif de transport de charges pour fours de traitement thermique | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB116949 (GIBBONS BROTHERS LTD, et al) [X] 1-4,7 * figures 8-10 *; | [X]FR611594 (BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]DE2831251 (SMIT OVENS NIJMEGEN BV) [AD] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE929416 (LUDOWICI WILHELM DR-ING) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2221365 (STEULER NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0473885 (KRUPP POLYSIUS AG [DE]) [A] * figures 2,3 *; | [A]FR2536726 (INFRAFOURS [FR]); | [A]DE1002016 (IAOFUIA OFENBAU UNION GES MIT) |