EP1033466 - Protection device for infill panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states An der Heiden, Dominik Westfalenweg 93 48485 Wesel / DE | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103629.4 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033466 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/58, E06B5/11 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
E06B3/5892 (EP);
E06B5/116 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [2001/21] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 17.12.1999 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Sicherung eines Ausfachelementes | [2000/36] | English: | Protection device for infill panel | [2000/36] | French: | Dispositif de protection pour panneau de remplissage | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 02.04.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, IE, MC, PT, SE | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19701281 (FEK HAUSTUERFUELLUNGEN GMBH) [X] 1,2,4-9,11 * column 5, line 31 - column 7, line 17; figure - *; | [X]DE8507808U (REPOL OLYESTER-PRODUKTE) [X] 1,4,7,9,11-14 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 24 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 12, line 26 - page 13, line 18 * * figure - *; | [X]DE3907654 (RIEXINGER TUERENWERK) [X] 1,6,11 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 56; figure - *; | [XY]DE19741788 (PIP AG) [X] 1,5,7,11,14 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 55; figure - * [Y] 2; | [YA]DE2751424 (SCHOERGHUBER OHG) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,7,9,11,14; | [A]GB2283043 (J K R SERVICES LIMITED) [A] 1,2,6,7,9,11 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 7; figure - * |