EP0940527 - Movable structure for use as toilet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMMEGI S.A.S. DI GIOVANNARDI DOTT. MAURO & LORENZO MONTI Via Lega Insurrezionale 10 22100 Como / IT | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giovannardi, Maurizio Via Lega Insurrezionale, 10 22100 Como / IT | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Lecce, Giovanni UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. Via Ariberto 24 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Lecce, Giovanni UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. via G. Negri,10 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99103654.2 | 25.02.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | IT1998MI00138U | 05.03.1998 Original published format: IT MI980138 U | [1999/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940527 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940527 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04H1/12, E04B1/348 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
E04B1/34869 (EP);
E04H1/1216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | Transportable Struktur zum Gebrauch als Toilette | [1999/36] | English: | Movable structure for use as toilet | [1999/36] | French: | Structure transportable utilisée comme toilette | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 02.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/11] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4065885 (BLICK III JOHN S, et al) [X] 1,3-5,7 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 31; figure - * [Y] 2,9,11; | [X]FR2685726 (FRANCE PROPRETE SARL [FR]) [X] 1,4,8 * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 12; figure - *; | [Y]EP0481246 (ACCIAI CENTRO SPA [IT]) [Y] 2,11 * figure 2 *; | [Y]FR2179372 (MOUNIE PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 9 * page 2, line 1 - line 9; figures 1,6 * |