EP0945213 - Cleaning apparatus for conical shanks of tool holders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DECKEL MAHO GmbH Tiroler Strasse 85 D-87459 Pfronten / DE | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seitz, Reinhold Heimen 49 87659 Hopferau / DE | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104038.7 | 16.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | DE19982005321U | 24.03.1998 Original published format: DE 29805321 U | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945213 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945213 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945213 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, B08B1/04 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
B23Q11/005 (EP);
B23Q11/0042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/39] | B23Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/51] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reinigungsvorrichtung für die Kegelschäfte von Werkzeugaufnahmen | [1999/39] | English: | Cleaning apparatus for conical shanks of tool holders | [1999/39] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage pour des queues coniques de portes-outils | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0420039 (STARRFRAESMASCHINEN AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 31 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0458014 (BURKHARDT & WEBER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH01153248 ; | [A]JPH04111745 ; | [A]DE4228268 (KELCH & CO WERKZEUGMASCHF [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29515273U (EGGER ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 21 * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890913), vol. 013, no. 415, Database accession no. (M - 870), & JP01153248 A 19890615 (A T SHII KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920804), vol. 016, no. 359, Database accession no. (M - 1289), & JP04111745 A 19920413 (EI TEI SHII KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |