EP0940375 - Method and apparatus for producing shaped bodies from resin concrete [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILOMA AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK GmbH Schledehauser Weg 93a D-49086 Osnabrück / DE | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104124.5 | 02.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | DE19981009107 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19809107 | [1999/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940375 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940375 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B26/02, B01F3/12, B29C67/24 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C04B26/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/02, C04B14/06, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0028, C04B2103/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/36] | C04B26/02, C04B40/00 | Designated contracting states | [2002/39] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus Reaktionsharzbeton | [1999/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing shaped bodies from resin concrete | [1999/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de pièces moulés en béton de résine | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2608306 (DREYER HANS) [A] 1,17 * page 8, paragraph 1; figure 7; claim - *; | [A]EP0611891 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9700915 (CIBA GEIGY AG ;HAYES BARRIE JAMES (GB); WOMBWELL PAUL TERRENCE (GB) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]DE3822202 (SANDOZ AG) [A] 1 * claim 12 *; | [A]AT305862B (RECH DES NOUVEAUX AGGLOMERANTS) [A] 1 * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 29; claim - * |