EP0964140 - Compression ignition type engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murata, Hiroki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Shizuo c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/50] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104193.0 | 02.03.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | JP19980067017 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6701798 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964140 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964140 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964140 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02D21/06 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
B60K6/24 (EP,US);
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
F02D41/0057 (EP,US);
F02D41/3064 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/28 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/51] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Motor mit Verdichtungszündung | [1999/50] | English: | Compression ignition type engine | [1999/50] | French: | Moteur à allumage par compression | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 25.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0543433 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) | by applicant | JPH04334750 |