blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0943572

EP0943572 - Display system for a spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 601 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]For all designated states
Murata Kikai Kabushiki Kaisha
3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin
Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
02 / Hori, Tetsuya Murata Kikai Koutariryo B-310
1-8-21, Higashikoutari
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto / JP
03 / Ikkai, Tomoyuki Murata Kikai Koutariryo C-210
1-8-21, Higashikoutari
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto / JP
[1999/38]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner Part mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99104290.403.03.1999
[1999/38]
Priority number, dateJP1998007163320.03.1998         Original published format: JP 7163398
JP1998007163420.03.1998         Original published format: JP 7163498
[1999/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0943572
Date:22.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0943572
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:B65H63/06, D01H13/32
[1999/38]
CPC:
D01H13/26 (EP); D01H13/32 (EP); B65H2551/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   LI [2000/39]
Former [1999/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anzeigeeinrichtung für eine Spinnereimaschine[1999/38]
English:Display system for a spinning machine[1999/38]
French:Système d'affichage pour un métier à filer[1999/38]
Examination procedure14.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
02.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/24]
20.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4209203  (SCHLAFHORST & CO W) [X] 1,7 * column 5, line 16 - line 26 * * column 8, line 9 - line 25 * * column 8, line 30 - line 33 * * column 8, line 47 - line 51 *;
 [A]EP0622481  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4019957  (ZELLWEGER USTER AG) [A] 1,7 * figure -; claims 1,4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.