EP0943382 - Process and device for controlling the heat flow of a continuous casting mould during continuous slab casting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnolds, Gerhard Wedauerstrasse 15 45481 Mühlheim / DE | 02 /
Parschat, Lothar An der Dellen 2a 40885 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Pleschiutschnigg, Fritz-Peter, Prof., Dr., Ing. Reiserweg 69 47629 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Plociennik, Uwe Noldenkothen 21 40882 Ratingen / DE | 05 /
Schwellenbach, Joachim Hüttenstrasse 106 40215 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
Streubel, Hans Schlüterstrasse 30 40699 Erkrath / DE | 07 /
Zajber, Adolf Gartenstrasse 7 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 08 /
Arzberger, Matthias Osterroder Strasse 5 40596 Düsseldorf / DE | 09 /
Langer, Mertin Elberfelderstrasse 206 42553 Velbert / DE | 10 /
Letzel, Dirk, Dr. Plättchesheide 5 40878 Ratingen / DE | 11 /
Moll, Hans Pastor-Breuer Strasse 16 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1999/38] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104351.4 | 04.03.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | DE1998110672 | 12.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19810672 | [1999/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943382 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943382 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/22 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
B22D11/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/22] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle des Wärmestromes einer Kokille beim Stranggiessen von Brammen | [1999/38] | English: | Process and device for controlling the heat flow of a continuous casting mould during continuous slab casting | [1999/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle du débit calorifique dans une lingotière de coulée continue lors de la coulée de brames | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 23.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 24.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.08.2004 | NL | 25.08.2004 | SE | 25.11.2004 | ES | 06.12.2004 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 25.08.2004 | |
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | SE | 25.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 25.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1916503 (WIENER SCHWACHSTROMWERKE GMBH) [A] 5,7 * figures 1-3; claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE2160206 (FISCHER & PORTER GMBH) [A] 5,7* figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2415224 (CONCAST AG) [A] 1 * figure 5; claims 1-11 *; | [DX]DE19529931 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [DX] 1-9 * column 1, line 40 - column 4, line 7; figures 1,2 * |