EP0949418 - Micro-pump and micro-pump manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinohara, Jun c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Furuta, Kazuyoshi c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104474.4 | 05.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980053906 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5390698 | JP19980065908 | 16.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6590898 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949418 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949418 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949418 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/04 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
F04B43/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2001/06] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mikropumpe und Herstellungsverfahren für die Mikropumpe | [1999/41] | English: | Micro-pump and micro-pump manufacturing method | [1999/41] | French: | Micropompe et procédé de fabrication de cette micropompe | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 07.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 08.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59221485 ; | [XA]EP0465229 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 7,9,10 * abstract * * page 6, line 29 - page 13, line 25 * * figures 1-10 * [A] 1,3,8,14; | [A]US5171132 (MIYAZAKI HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,7,9,10,14-16 * abstract * * column 12, line 3 - column 14, line 31 * * figures 29-32 *; | [XA]US5277556 (VAN LINTEL HARALD T G [NL]) [X] 7,9,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - column 5, line 36 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1,3,8,14; | [XA]EP0587912 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 7,9,10 * abstract * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 26 * * column 13, line 12 - column 15, line 46 * * figures 6,7,17-21 * [A] 1,3,8,14 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850427), vol. 009, no. 098, Database accession no. (M - 375), & JP59221485 A 19841213 (SHARP KK) [A] 1,7,14 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05164052 | JPH05263763 |