EP0940602 - Vibration insulating mount [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akatsu, Yousuke 4-10-32-202, Hiyoshihoncho, Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Satou, Shigeki 883-4, Kagawa Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Takeshi 2-13-5-207, Tsurugaoka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Aoki, Kazushige 2-5-1-201, Numame Isehara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104501.4 | 05.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | JP19980055254 | 06.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5525498 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0940602 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0940602 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940602 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/26 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
F16F13/264 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/51] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schwingungsisolierendes Lager | [1999/36] | English: | Vibration insulating mount | [1999/36] | French: | Support isolateur de vibrations | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 22.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.01.2005 | [2006/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0855535 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 27 *; | [XA]DE19641239 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,3 * * figure 10 * [A] 5-7; | [X]US5718417 (AOKI KAZUSHIGE [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,12 * figures 1,9 * * column 10, line 9 - line 14 *; | [X]EP0528111 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 43 - line 53 *; | [A]JPH09257091 ; | [A]JPH09273585 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09257091 A 19970930 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09273585 A 19971021 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09250590 | JPH0859219 | JPH1055254 |