EP0942604 - Method and apparatus for generating a bounding rectangle of a vop for interlaced scan type video signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Curitel, Inc. San 136-1, Ami-ri, Bubal-eub, Ichon-shi Kyoungki-do / KR | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Hynix Semiconductor Inc. San 136-1, Ami-ri, Pubal-eup Ichon-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Hyundai Electronics Industries Co., Ltd. San 136-1, Ami-ri, Bubal-eub Ichon-shi, Kyoungki-do 467-860 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Cheol Soo 302 Daiwon villa, 492-18, Wooman-1 dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do, 442-191 / KR | 02 /
Moon, Joo Hee 603-2206 Hyundai APT, 610, Guui-3 dong Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 143-203 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Hae Kwang 467-14, Kunja-dong Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 143-150 / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jong Deuk 201,116-16 Okum-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul, 138-130 / KR | [2000/13] |
Former [1999/46] | 01 /
Park, Cheol Soo 302 Daiwon villa, 492-18, Wooman-1 dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do, 442-191 / KR | ||
02 /
Moon, Joo Hee 603-2206 Hyundai APT, 610, Guui-3 dong Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 143-203 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Hae Kwang 467-14, Kunja-dong Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 143-150 / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Jong Deuk 101-211, Hyundai APT, 104, Moonjung-1 dong Songpa-gu, Seoul, 138-201 / KR | |||
Former [1999/37] | 01 /
Park, Cheol Soo 302 Daiwon villa, 492-18, Wooman-1 dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do, 442-191 / KR | ||
02 /
Moon, Joo Hee 602-2206 Hyundai APT, 610, Guui-3 dong Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 143-203 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Hae Kwang 467-14, Kunja-dong Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 143-150 / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Jong Deuk 101-211, Hyundai APT, 104, Moonjung-1 dong Songpa-gu, Seoul, 138-201 / KR | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104623.6 | 09.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | KR19980007977 | 10.03.1998 Original published format: KR 9807977 | KR19990004675 | 10.02.1999 Original published format: KR 9904675 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0942604 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0942604 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942604 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
H04N19/119 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/37] | Extension states | AL | 17.07.2001 | LT | 17.07.2001 | LV | 17.07.2001 | MK | 17.07.2001 | RO | 17.07.2001 | SI | 17.07.2001 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines begrenzenden Rechtecks einer Videoobjektfläche für zwischenzeilenabgetastete Videosignale | [2001/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for generating a bounding rectangle of a vop for interlaced scan type video signals | [1999/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif générant un rectangle limitant d'un plan objets vidéo pour signaux vidéo de type de balayage non entralacé | [1999/37] |
Former [1999/37] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines begrenzten Rechtecks einer Video-Objektfläche für zwischenzeilen-abgetestete Videosignale | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.2002 | BE | 12.06.2002 | CH | 12.06.2002 | GR | 12.06.2002 | LI | 12.06.2002 | DK | 12.09.2002 | PT | 16.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | CY | 09.03.2003 | LU | 09.03.2003 | IE | 10.03.2003 | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
LU | 09.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
BE | 12.06.2002 | ||
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
DK | 12.09.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
PT | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
GR | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 12.06.2002 | |
CH | 12.06.2002 | ||
LI | 12.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 12.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0806871 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [DA] 1-6 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 43 * * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 32 *; | [A]EP0809405 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 5 * * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0863673 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [PA] 1-6 * page 4, lines 35-38 *; | [PA]GB2325582 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PA] 1-6* page 1, line 13 - page 7, line 2 * |