Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100335629B | 08.05.2002 | B1 | KR19990077417 | 25.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980007977 | 10.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3382173B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2003 | B2 | JPH11331836 | 30.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980007977 | 10.03.1998 | KR19990004675 | 10.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0942604 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2002 | B1 | EP0942604 | 07.03.2001 | A3 | EP0942604 | 15.09.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19980007977 | 10.03.1998 | KR19990004675 | 10.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE219314T | 15.06.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980007977 | 10.03.1998 | KR19990004675 | 10.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69901744T | 24.10.2002 | T2 | DE69901744D1 | 18.07.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980007977 | 10.03.1998 | KR19990004675 | 10.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6396957 | 28.05.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980007977 | 10.03.1998 | KR19990004675 | 10.02.1999 |