EP1035563 - A handling device and method for moving a pod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | For all designated states Infineon Technologies SC300 GmbH & Co. KG Königsbrücker Strasse 180 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | ||
For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | |||
For all designated states Infineon Technologies SC300 GmbH & Co. KG Königsbrücker Strasse 180 01099 Dresden / DE | |||
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | ||
For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | |||
For all designated states Semiconductor300 GmbH & Co KG Postfach 100446 01074 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stanley, Timothy Daryl Stendaler Strasse 10 01109 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Lering, Michael Birkenallee 104 09188 Bubenreuth / DE | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Richardt, Markus Albert Motorola GmbH Hagenauerstrasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Richardt, Markus Albert Motorola GmbH, Hagenauerstrasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2000/37] | Richardt, Markus Albert Motorola GmbH, Intellectual Property Dept., Hagenauerstrasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104660.8 | 09.03.1999 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035563 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
H01L21/67775 (EP);
A41B9/02 (KR);
A41B9/026 (KR);
A41B2400/20 (KR);
A41B2400/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/22] |
Former [2000/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Handhabungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bewegung eines Behälters | [2000/37] | English: | A handling device and method for moving a pod | [2000/37] | French: | Dispositif de manipulation et méthode pour déplacer un conteneur | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 19.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06163505 ; | [A]EP0552756 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [XA]US5746008 (YAMASHITA TEPPEI [JP], et al); | [A]WO9846503 (ASYST TECHNOLOGIES [US]) |