EP0972717 - Blank for a packaging carton [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KISTERS MASCHINENBAU GMBH Boschstrasse 1-3 D-47533 Kleve / DE | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marti, Jean Uhlandstrasse 8 47533 Kleve / DE | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Röther, Peter Patentanwälte Dr. Brundert & Röther Kolkmannskamp 6 44879 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Röther, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Vor dem Tore 16a 47279 Duisburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104736.6 | 10.03.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | DE1998212293U | 11.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29812293 U | [2000/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0972717 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0972717 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP);
B65D2571/00141 (EP);
B65D2571/0066 (EP);
B65D2571/00728 (EP);
B65D2571/0087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/40] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zuschnitt für einen Verpackungskarton | [2000/03] | English: | Blank for a packaging carton | [2000/03] | French: | Flan pour carton d'emballage | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/20] | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5072876 (RIVERWOOD) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 5; figure 2 *; | [A]US5360113 (RIVERWOOD) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 58-68; figure 9 *; | [A]WO9403374 (MEAD CORP.) [A] 1 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0754631 (MEAD CORP.) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 24-35; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0473266 (MEAD CORP.) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 12-32; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2656278 (WPT VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK) [A] 1 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 7; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9707031 (RIVERWOOD) [A] 1 * abstract * |