EP0945264 - Anionic infrared-ray absorbing agent, photosensitive composition and planographic printing plate precursor using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Tatsuo Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Kunita, Kazuto Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Morishima, Shinichi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105081.6 | 24.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | JP19980079912 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7991298 | JP19980237634 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23763498 | JP19980270097 | 24.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27009798 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945264 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945264 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, B41M5/36, C09B23/08, B41M5/40 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
C09B23/086 (EP,US);
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
B41C2210/02 (EP,US);
B41C2210/06 (EP,US);
B41C2210/20 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anionischer Infrarotabsorber, photoempfindliche Zusammensetzung und Flachdruckform-Vorstufe | [1999/39] | English: | Anionic infrared-ray absorbing agent, photosensitive composition and planographic printing plate precursor using same | [1999/39] | French: | Absorbeur d'infrarouge anionique, composition photosensible et précurseur de plaque d'impression planographique | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 30.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4632895 (PATEL RANJANA C [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 17, line 42 *; | [A]WO9739894 (HORSELL GRAPHIC IND LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * example - *; | [A]GB1245924 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]) [A] 1 * example 9 *; | [A]US4763966 (SUZUKI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [PX]EP0901902 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1 * page 21 *; | [E]EP0908305 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [E] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [E]EP0911153 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [E] 1,2 * page 26, line 40 - line 55 * * page 49, line 15 - line 40 * * page 57, line 15 - line 35 *; | [E]EP0908306 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [E] 1 * page 16, line 25 - page 17, line 40 * * page 20, line 42 - line 50 * |