EP0949435 - Gear with integrated clutch spline and its forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/41] | Gear with integrated cluch spline and its forming method | ||
[1999/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Steel MFG. CO., LTD. 2-22 Harumi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Steel MFG. CO., LTD. 2-22 Harumi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Akio, Mitsubishi Steel Mfg. Co. Ltd Utsunomiya Works, Hiraidekogyodanchi 1 Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi 321-0905 / JP | 02 /
Fukasawa, Hidekazu, Mitsubishi Steel Mfg. Co. Ltd. Utsunomiya Works, Hiraidekogyodanchi 1 Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi 321-0905 / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Fiener, Josef Postfach 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105118.6 | 25.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980095966 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9596698 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949435 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949435 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949435 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/17, B21K1/30, F16D23/02 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
F16D23/02 (EP);
B21K1/30 (EP);
F16H55/17 (EP);
F16H55/171 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/51] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zahnrad mit integrierter Kupplungsverzahnung und dessen Herstellung | [1999/41] | English: | Gear with integrated clutch spline and its forming method | [1999/46] | French: | Engrenage avec denture d'accouplement integrée et sa méthode de fabrication | [1999/41] |
Former [1999/41] | Gear with integrated cluch spline and its forming method | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 29.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Request for further processing for: | 04.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2005 | Decision despatched | 08.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4938089 (OHOKA NOBORU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 24; figures 1,2; claim . * [A] 2; | [A]JPH02200341 ; | [XPA]DE19744639 (HIRSCHVOGEL UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 19 - line 29 * * figures 1,11 * [A] 2,3; | [A]EP0552021 (O OKA FORGE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 17; figures 1,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901025), vol. 014, no. 491, Database accession no. (M - 1040), & JP02200341 A 19900808 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 3 * abstract * |