EP0949145 - Method and machine for packaging of objects, by means of pieces of sheet material obtained from a continuous strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baumer S.r.l. Via Emilia Ovest, 91-93 40013 Castelfranco Emilia (Modena) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Baumer S.r.l. Via Emilia Ovest, 91-93 40013 Castelfranco Emilia (Modena) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gambetti, Mario Via Ruggimenta, 485 40014 Crevalcore (Bologna) / IT | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstraße 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105229.1 | 13.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | IT1998BO00227 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: IT BO980227 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949145 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949145 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/10, B65B59/00 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B65B11/10 (EP,US);
B65B53/063 (EP);
B65B59/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen mittels Zuschnitten aus einer kontinuierlichen Bahn | [1999/41] | English: | Method and machine for packaging of objects, by means of pieces of sheet material obtained from a continuous strip | [1999/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'emballage d'objets au moyen de feuilles obtenues à partir d'une bande continue | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 07.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.09.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0581747 (DIMAC SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0629551 (BAUMER SRL [IT]) [A] 6* abstract * | by applicant | GB1355466 | US5203144 |