EP0923082 - Semiconductor memory having a sense amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumakura, Sinsuke, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Yamazaki, Hirokazu, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Hisayoshi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kasa, Yasushi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99105425.5 | 08.02.1994 | [1999/24] | Priority number, date | JP19930057135 | 17.03.1993 Original published format: JP 5713593 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0923082 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0923082 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
G11C29/021 (EP,KR,US);
G11C29/24 (EP,KR,US);
G11C29/02 (EP,US);
G11C29/1201 (KR);
G11C29/38 (KR);
G11C29/44 (EP,US);
G11C29/50 (EP,US);
G11C29/50004 (EP,US);
G11C29/50016 (EP,US);
G11C29/56004 (KR);
G11C29/56016 (KR);
G11C5/14 (EP,US);
G11C5/143 (EP,US);
G11C7/062 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (EP,US);
G11C2029/5006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/24] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeichervorrichtung mit Abfühlverstärker | [1999/24] | English: | Semiconductor memory having a sense amplifier | [1999/24] | French: | Mémoire à semi-conducteur avec amplificateur de détection | [1999/24] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 29.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/09] | 29.09.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94101897.0 / EP0616335 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5132932 (TOBITA YOUICHI [JP]) |