Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0945329 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2002 | B1 | EP0945329 | 29.03.2000 | A3 | EP0945329 | 29.09.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19813752 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19813752 | 22.07.2004 | B4 | DE19813752 | 30.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19813752 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59903798D1 | 30.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19813752 | 27.03.1998 |